Global Patent Index - EP 0864162 B1

EP 0864162 B1 2000-02-23 - APPARATUS FOR REMOTE DISMANTLING OF IRRADIATED STRUCTURES

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR REMOTE DISMANTLING OF IRRADIATED STRUCTURES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR FERNZERLEGUNG BESTRAHLTER KOMPONENTEN

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE DEMANTELEMENT A DISTANCE DE STRUCTURES IRRADIEES

Publication

EP 0864162 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96941072 A

Priority

  • FR 9601886 W
  • FR 9514177 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9720323A1] An apparatus including an abrasive liquid jet cutting module with a movable omnidirectionally adjustable nozzle (25) supporting a sensor (37) for determining in advance the position or shape of the structure to be cut, a dosemeter (49) for measuring the radiation level, and a decontamination device (51) for removing excess contamination. Cutting residues may be collected by suction. Said apparatus is more universal than currently known apparatuses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 9/34; B24C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21F 9/30 (2006.01); B24C 1/04 (2006.01); B24C 3/02 (2006.01); G21F 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/045 (2013.01); G21F 9/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9720323 A1 19970605; AU 1033997 A 19970619; DE 69606778 D1 20000330; DE 69606778 T2 20000921; EP 0864162 A1 19980916; EP 0864162 B1 20000223; FR 2741991 A1 19970606; FR 2741991 B1 19980116; JP 2000501180 A 20000202; JP 4386964 B2 20091216; US 6049580 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111128

2012-09-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69606778

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111128

2012-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111128

2012-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CIE GENERALE DES MATIERES *NUCLEAIRES

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101117

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2003-11-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606778 20000330

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990305

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980414

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI