Global Patent Index - EP 0864165 B1

EP 0864165 B1 2000-08-02 - HIGH ISOLATION POWER TRANSFORMER

Title (en)

HIGH ISOLATION POWER TRANSFORMER

Title (de)

LEISTUNGSTRANSFORMATOR HOHER ISOLATION

Title (fr)

TRANSFORMATEUR DE PUISSANCE A FORTE ISOLATION

Publication

EP 0864165 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96940047 A

Priority

  • GB 9602976 W
  • GB 9524566 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2307795A] An isolation transformer comprises two or more independent magnetic paths formed by high permeability magnetic cores 7, 8. Each magnetic core 7, 8 includes one or more independent windings 1, 4 and at least one coupling winding 6. Each core 7, 8 and its independent associated winding(s) 1, 4 is enclosed by an electrostatic screen 2, 5 whilst the coupling winding 6 is located outside the electrostatic screen 2, 5. The coupling winding 6 may be formed by interconnecting separate windings associated with individual cores and may be arranged to couple with more than two cores. Alternatively a core with a primary winding may be linked by plural coupling windings to respective secondary cores to drive plural secondary output windings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 30/16; H01F 27/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/34 (2006.01); H01F 30/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 30/16 (2013.01); H01F 27/346 (2013.01); H01F 2019/085 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 4412957 A1 19951019 - SCHWAN ULRICH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

GB 2307795 A 19970604; GB 9524566 D0 19960131; DE 69609625 D1 20000907; DE 69609625 T2 20010412; EP 0864165 A1 19980916; EP 0864165 B1 20000802; WO 9721233 A1 19970612

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071202

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071202

2007-03-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2003-12-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609625 20000907

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-08-02 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981112

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980626

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI