Global Patent Index - EP 0864245 B1

EP 0864245 B1 2000-08-02 - METHOD FOR REPRODUCING BALL SOUNDS DURING A SPORTING EVENT, AND BALL THEREFOR

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REPRODUCING BALL SOUNDS DURING A SPORTING EVENT, AND BALL THEREFOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERGABE VON BALLGERÄUSCHEN WÄHREND EINER SPORTVERANSTALTUNG UND BALL DAZU

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA RESTITUTION DES BRUITS DE BALLON LORS D'UNE MANIFESTATION SPORTIVE ET BALLON POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 0864245 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96941087 A

Priority

  • FR 9601903 W
  • FR 9514142 A
  • FR 9609758 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9720449A1] A method for reproducing the sound environment during a sporting event involving a ball. A device (13) built into the ball comprises a radiofrequency transmitter and a microphone, and is positioned inside the ball by a flexible suspension means. A radiofrequency receiver is provided adjacent to the playing area for receiving signals from the device (13) inside the ball and reproducing an audio signal corresponding to the sound environment picked up by the microphone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2006.01); A63B 24/00 (2006.01); A63B 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2013.01); A63B 43/00 (2013.01); A63B 2220/17 (2013.01); A63B 2225/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9720449 A1 19970605; AT 195210 T 20000815; AU 1034897 A 19970619; BR 9611798 A 19991228; CN 1211379 A 19990317; DE 69609626 D1 20000907; EA 000895 B1 20000626; EA 199800487 A1 19981224; EP 0864245 A1 19980916; EP 0864245 B1 20000802; JP 2000500943 A 20000125

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-13 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOUNDBALL

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-04-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-01-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000802

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-11-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609626 20000907

2000-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19980527

2000-08-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195210 T 20000815

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990401

1999-12-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR REPRODUCING BALL SOUNDS DURING A SPORTING EVENT, AND BALL THEREFOR

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990401

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980527

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 980527