Global Patent Index - EP 0864265 B1

EP 0864265 B1 2001-05-02 - Locking means for an ear jewel

Title (en)

Locking means for an ear jewel

Title (de)

Befestigung für Ohrschmuck

Title (fr)

Dispositif de retenue d'un bouton d'oreille

Publication

EP 0864265 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98200569 A

Priority

NL 1005531 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864265A1] The invention relates to a locking means for an ear jewel to be inserted into a pierced ear. The ear jewel comprises an ornamental element (10) to be positioned on the outside of the ear and a locking element joint to the ornamental element. The locking element (20) comprises a straight first segment (23) for passing through the ear, which first segment is joint to the ornamental element at a substantially right angle, and a substantially 90 DEG -bent segment (21) joint to the first segment, and a substantially straight tubular segment joint to the bent segment and a movable securing element (30) running through the tubular segment. The securing element (30) comprises adjoining wires (31) which under the influence of a pre-tension deflect away from each other. The wire elements are fashioned from different wire pieces which, at least at a first end, form an angle and are joint to a first coupling element (32). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 7/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864265 A1 19980916; EP 0864265 B1 20010502; DE 69800739 D1 20010607; NL 1005531 C2 19980915

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-10-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020223

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020223

2002-02-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020117

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800739 20010607

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-05-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990928

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990120

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI