Global Patent Index - EP 0864276 A3

EP 0864276 A3 2001-01-10 - Foldable chair having rear legs rotatable about a coaxial column

Title (en)

Foldable chair having rear legs rotatable about a coaxial column

Title (de)

Klappstuhl mit rotierenden Hinterbeinen

Title (fr)

Chaise pliable avec pieds d'arrière rotatifs

Publication

EP 0864276 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98200424 A

Priority

IT MI970101 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864276A2] Foldable chair consisting of a frame (10) comprising two pairs of uprights (11,12) forming the front and rear legs of the chair, each upright (11) of the associated pair being connected to the other one (12) by an associated cross-piece (13), the seat (3) being hinged, via associated means (20), to the rear uprights (11), in which the said rear uprights (11) are extended upwards by means of respective columns (15) for supporting the backrest (2), characterized in that said rear uprights (11) are connected to the respective column (15) arranged above via associated coaxial means (14) designed to allow rotation of the upright (11) relative to the column (15) so as to obtain folding of the chair. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/00; A47C 4/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864276 A2 19980916; EP 0864276 A3 20010110; IT 236469 Y1 20000817; IT MI970101 U1 19980812

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI