Global patent index - EP 0864277 A3

EP 0864277 A3 2001-01-17 - A storing device in the armrest of a sofa or armchair

Title (en)

A storing device in the armrest of a sofa or armchair

Title (de)

Lagervorrichtung in eine Armlehne eines Sofas oder Sessels

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rangement formé dans une manchette de canapé ou fauteuil

Publication

EP 0864277 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98400453 A

Priority

FR 9702946 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864277A2] The storage space arranged in an armchair or settee comprises a drawer (1) which occupies the whole of the internal volume of the back oversleeve (2). The drawer slides along an axis parallel to the longitudinal axis of the oversleeve. The drawer has guides and runners enabling the total withdrawal of the drawer outside the oversleeve. Each runner and guide is located so as to remain invisible from the outside even when the drawer is withdrawn. The upper face of the drawer forms a support plane, the drawer front face being provided with a cover (3) for concealing the drawer when it is retracted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/62; A47C 7/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/62 (2006.01); A47C 7/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/62 (2013.01); A47C 7/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864277 A2 19980916; EP 0864277 A3 20010117; FR 2760611 A1 19980918; FR 2760611 B1 19990611

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030322

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021111

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990211

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI