Global Patent Index - EP 0864338 A3

EP 0864338 A3 2000-10-18 - Device for delayed activation of a valve

Title (en)

Device for delayed activation of a valve

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur verzögerten Betätigung eines Ventils

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'activation retardée d'une soupape

Publication

EP 0864338 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102502 A

Priority

DE 19710377 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864338A2] The delay time is adjustable through an electro-mechanically operated time-delay appliance consists of a motor-driven threaded spindle (16) with a non-rotary threaded nut (17),and a drive pin (18) operating a bolt (21). The delay appliance affects an opening element of the valve by means of a release which has a locking element which is released after the time-delay time has elapsed and operates the opening element. The bolt with the locking element, and the threaded spindle with the threaded nut are contained in a lidded housing (8). The threaded spindle leads through a side wall (10) in the housing and is connected to a motor flange-mounted on the housing. The locking element is joined to the release outside the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 37/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/04 (2006.01); A62C 13/12 (2006.01); A62C 37/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 37/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864338 A2 19980916; EP 0864338 A3 20001018; EP 0864338 B1 20030507; AT 239527 T 20030515; CZ 291640 B6 20030416; CZ 9800707 A3 19990217; DE 19710377 A1 19980917; DE 19710377 C2 20011031; HU 223850 B1 20050228; HU 9800492 A2 19990528; HU 9800492 A3 20010328; HU 9800492 D0 19980428; PL 186271 B1 20031231; PL 325228 A1 19980914; SK 285103 B6 20060601; SK 33898 A3 19981007

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170201

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2003-08-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808212 P 20030612

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK LI NL

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020425

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK LI NL

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK LI NL

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI