Global Patent Index - EP 0864384 A3

EP 0864384 A3 2001-05-30 - Process for cutting metallic pieces with a high degree of finishing

Title (en)

Process for cutting metallic pieces with a high degree of finishing

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Stanzen von Metallteilen mit hohem Endbearbeitungsgrad

Title (fr)

Méthode de découpage des pièces métalliques avec un haut degré de finition

Publication

EP 0864384 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98200758 A

Priority

IT MI970538 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864384A2] A process for cutting metallic pieces with a high degree of precision and surface finishing from a continuous material or cut-down sizes inserted into a die between a matrix (12) and a punch (13) interacting between each other, comprising: a first cutting phase in which a piece (10) is separated from a scrap or other piece (11) opposite a surface having a mixed profile; a second cutting phase of said piece (10) opposite said surface having a mixed profile (15, 16, 17), so as to achieve a smooth finished surface (21). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 28/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864384 A2 19980916; EP 0864384 A3 20010530; IT 1290051 B1 19981019; IT MI970538 A1 19980914

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030805

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

2002-02-20 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010911

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI