Global Patent Index - EP 0864408 B1

EP 0864408 B1 2002-11-06 - Device for continuously tempering mixtures of bulk material or building material

Title (en)

Device for continuously tempering mixtures of bulk material or building material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum kontinuierlichen Anmachen von Schüttgut- oder Baustoffmischungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour gâcher en continu des mélanges des matières en vrac ou des matériaux de construction

Publication

EP 0864408 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98103963 A

Priority

DE 19710067 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864408A1] A dispenser (6) for the bulk material is next to a feeder (2) and has a tubular mixer chamber (9) into which opens a connection (16) for the liquid. The dispenser consists of a metering screw (8) rotating in a duct (7), and a rotary shaft (10) in the mixer chamber with stirrer and mixer implements (11). Near or at the end of the mixer chamber is a discharge opening (12). The side of the metering duct facing away from the feeder or feeder container (3) has an extension (15) protruding into the mixer chamber and possessing a downward-pointing outlet (17). The connection for the liquid opens out into the mixer chamber in front of the end of the extension in the form of a pipe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/022 (2013.01); B01F 7/00708 (2013.01); B01F 7/04 (2013.01); B01F 15/0251 (2013.01); B28C 5/1292 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864408 A1 19980916; EP 0864408 B1 20021106; AT 227199 T 20021115; DE 19710067 C1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 227199 T

- Effective date: 20180306

2018-03-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59806140

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-03-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2004-09-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-09-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806140 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227199 T 20021115

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020514

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981007

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI