Global Patent Index - EP 0864519 B1

EP 0864519 B1 2003-06-25 - Apparatus to guide webs in a floating manner

Title (en)

Apparatus to guide webs in a floating manner

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur schwebenden Führung von Bändern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour guider une bande de façon flottante

Publication

EP 0864519 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98104394 A

Priority

DE 19710142 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864519A1] The appliance has at least one blowing section (2,3) with suspension jets (11) for blowing processing gas onto at least one side of the web (1). A radial ventilator (7,8) with a 360 degree spiral housing (22) supplies the suspension jets. The radial ventilators blow in a direction (19) parallel to the direction (27) in which the web travels. The current from the radial ventilator at each longitudinal end of each blowing section is deflected in a U-shape to the web.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/24; F26B 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/24 (2006.01); C21D 9/63 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/63 (2013.01); B65H 23/24 (2013.01); B65H 2406/112 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864519 A1 19980916; EP 0864519 B1 20030625; AT 207844 T 20011115; AT 243648 T 20030715

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140311

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808779

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 243648 T

- Effective date: 20140311

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808779

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130313

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120311

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100311

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100311

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-09-26 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070627

2004-05-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OTTO JUNKER GMBH

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808779 P 20030731

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRAMER, CARL, PROF.DR.-ING.

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010220

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990308

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI