Global Patent Index - EP 0864674 B1

EP 0864674 B1 2001-04-25 - Device for producing or further processing sliver

Title (en)

Device for producing or further processing sliver

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung oder Weiterverarbeitung von Faserband

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la production ou le traitement ultérieur de mèche

Publication

EP 0864674 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98102688 A

Priority

DE 19710530 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864674A2] The apparatus to produce or process a sliver, such as a drawing unit or a card, has two monitor rollers (6) with the sliver moving between them to measure the sliver thickness. At least one roller (6) is powered by a shaft which is divided into a drive shaft (15) and a roller shaft (16), linked together by a coupling (1) which allows axial displacement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/38; D01H 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/38 (2006.01); D01H 13/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/26 (2013.01); D01H 5/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864674 A2 19980916; EP 0864674 A3 19990512; EP 0864674 B1 20010425; DE 19710530 A1 19980917; DE 19710530 B4 20070412; US 6119313 A 20000919

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070217

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080310

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-09-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800647 20010531

2001-05-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990819

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI