Global patent index - EP 0864681 A3

EP 0864681 A3 2000-03-22 - Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (en)

Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestrickes auf einer Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tricot dans un métier à tricoter rectiligne

Publication

EP 0864681 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98100931 A

Priority

DE 19709695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864681A2] A method of knitting a fabric (10) on a flatbed knitter with two facing needle beds (V,H), together with a parallel knitted section (11) over it, such as for a pocket flap or collar and the like, involves a maximum of every second needle of the beds (V,H) carrying a stitch of the ground fabric (10), and the facing needle of the other bed is empty. The stitches of at least one flap (11) are formed at the empty needles, after the fabric stitches have been transferred to the other bed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/00 (2006.01); D04B 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2013.01); D10B 2501/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864681 A2 19980916; EP 0864681 A3 20000322; EP 0864681 B1 20031022; CN 1077929 C 20020116; CN 1196413 A 19981021; DE 19709695 A1 19980917; ES 2205285 T3 20040501; JP 3072624 B2 20000731; JP H10251946 A 19980922; US 6085553 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050122

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050122

2005-01-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2205285

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-01-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040127

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809943

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020830

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI