Global Patent Index - EP 0864684 B1

EP 0864684 B1 2001-12-12 - System, method and control device for dosing detergent

Title (en)

System, method and control device for dosing detergent

Title (de)

Vorrichtung, Verfahren und Steuerungsvorrichtung zum Dosieren von Waschmittel

Title (fr)

Dispositif, procédé et dispositif de commande pour le dosage des détergents

Publication

EP 0864684 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98200506 A

Priority

  • EP 98200506 A
  • EP 97200693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864684A1] The invention relates to a system (1) for dosing detergent to a washing process comprising: a washing device (2) wherein the washing process takes place; a supply holder (3) for the detergent; a mixing chamber (4) for mixing the detergent with a solvent in a predetermined concentration range; measuring means (14) for measuring the concentration in the mixing chamber; and control means for controlling the supply of at least a part of the content of the mixing chamber to the washing device, wherein the system is provided with a dose controlling unit (22) which is connected to the control means and to the washing device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/02; A47L 15/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/44 (2006.01); D06F 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/44 (2013.01); D06F 39/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864684 A1 19980916; EP 0864684 B1 20011212; DE 69802857 D1 20020124; DE 69802857 T2 20020613; ES 2169893 T3 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-02 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69802857

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100218

2012-08-01 [REG NL PLEX] LIFTING OF FORMER PLEDGE

- Effective date: 20120724

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100218

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110307

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100217

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100217

2011-03-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110308

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100217

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DIVERSEY IP INTERNATIONAL BV

- Free text: DIVERSEY IP INTERNATIONAL BV#WORLD HEADQUARTERS TOWER B, 8TH FLOOR SCHIPHOL BOULEVARD 209#1118 BH LUCHTHAVEN SCHIPHOL AIRPORT (NL) -TRANSFER TO- DIVERSEY IP INTERNATIONAL BV#WORLD HEADQUARTERS TOWER B, 8TH FLOOR SCHIPHOL BOULEVARD 209#1118 BH LUCHTHAVEN SCHIPHOL AIRPORT (NL)

2004-12-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-09-29 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-02-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: DIVERSEY IP INTERNATIONAL BV

2003-11-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DIVERSEY IP INTERNATIONAL BV

2003-03-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-02-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2003-01-06 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.

2002-12-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V. TRANSFER- DIVERSEY IP INTERNATIONAL

2002-12-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DIVERSEY IP INTERNATIONAL BV

2002-11-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-10-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169893 T3

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802857 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000331

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980730

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI