Global Patent Index - EP 0864716 A3

EP 0864716 A3 2000-11-02 - Lock with a latch bolt, a dead bolt, and a follower

Title (en)

Lock with a latch bolt, a dead bolt, and a follower

Title (de)

Schloss mit Falle, Riegel und Schlossnuss

Title (fr)

Serrure avec un pêne demi-tour, un pêne dormant et un fouillot

Publication

EP 0864716 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98103784 A

Priority

DE 29704482 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864716A2] Pressure is exerted on the latch (4) via a pivot lever (7). A dog (8) is connected and disconnected by a coupling element (11) positioned between the bolt (5) and the dog. When the bolt is retracted, the dog produces a connected (9) and a disconnected (10) position by means of a radial cam (12). The lock nut (6) is a component separate from the pivot lever. The dog sits on the lock nut or pivot lever. The coupling element and dog are held in contact by a shared pair of slide surfaces (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 55/06; E05B 59/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 55/06 (2006.01); E05B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 55/06 (2013.01); E05B 59/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29704482 U1 19980716; AT 306003 T 20051015; DE 59813088 D1 20060216; EP 0864716 A2 19980916; EP 0864716 A3 20001102; EP 0864716 B1 20051005

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140304

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59813088

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 306003 T

- Effective date: 20140304

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59813088

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130313

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130322

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120304

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BKS GMBH

- Free text: BKS GMBH#HEIDESTRASSE 71#D-42549 VELBERT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BKS GMBH#HEIDESTRASSE 71#D-42549 VELBERT (DE)

2006-09-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813088 P 20060216

2005-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-10-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010723

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI NL

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI