Global Patent Index - EP 0864722 B1

EP 0864722 B1 2000-12-27 - Drive-cut off of a motor

Title (en)

Drive-cut off of a motor

Title (de)

Antriebsabschaltung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour une déconnexion d'entraînement d'un moteur

Publication

EP 0864722 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98104573 A

Priority

DE 19710390 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864722A2] The switch system for an electromotor, to switch the motor off according to the torque, has a torsion spring rod mounting between the stator and the fixed motor mounting. The switch (15,25) is within the housing, with a switch unit (17,27) at a relatively fixed intermediate section of the torsion rod or vice versa, to operate the switch (15,25) with the switching unit (17,27). The torsion spring rod is a quadrilateral rod (12), coaxial to the rotary axis of the armature (7) of the electromotor. One end (11) of the torsion rod is bonded to an armature plate (10), with its circumference secured to the housing, to transmit the force between the stator (8) and the end of the torsion rod.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/88 (2006.01); E06B 9/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/88 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6854 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864722 A2 19980916; EP 0864722 A3 19990414; EP 0864722 B1 20001227; DE 19710390 A1 19980917

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2005-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050318

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800398 20010201

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-11-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000602

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ERNST SELVE GMBH & CO. KG

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI