Global Patent Index - EP 0864735 B1

EP 0864735 B1 2001-12-19 - Method of operating a combustion engine in an innocuous manner

Title (en)

Method of operating a combustion engine in an innocuous manner

Title (de)

Verfahren zum schadstoffarmen Betrieb eines Verbrennungsmotors

Title (fr)

Procédé pour faire fonctionner un moteur à combustion interne de façon non nuisible

Publication

EP 0864735 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98103226 A

Priority

DE 19710833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864735A1] A procedure for operating an IC engine to be free of toxic emissions has at least one operating mode with a lean air/fuel ratio and one operating mode with a stoichiometric air/fuel ratio. Measures for reducing the NOx emissions are provided. The NOx reduction is effected during the operation in the stoichiometric mode in a previously given speed/torque range by timing adjustment from the point of optimum efficiency in the direction of retard. In the operating mode with a lean mixture, the timing is adjusted for optimum efficiency. The engine is run in a second speed/torque range with a lean mixture with a lower speed or torque than the first range and the two ranges are chosen so that the engine during normal operation is run more frequently in the second than in the first range.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 17/00; F02B 31/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864735 A1 19980916; EP 0864735 B1 20011219; DE 19710833 A1 19980917

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110225

2012-02-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802490

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110225

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100107

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-04-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-05-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802490 20020131

2002-01-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011220

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010525

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980706

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI