Global Patent Index - EP 0864741 B1

EP 0864741 B1 2000-05-31 - Device for flushing a charcoal canister and for leak testing of a vehicule engine fuel tank installation connected to said canister

Title (en)

Device for flushing a charcoal canister and for leak testing of a vehicule engine fuel tank installation connected to said canister

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Spülen einer Aktivkohlefalle und zur zeitweiligen Dichtheitsprüfung einer mit dieser verbundenen Brennstofftankanlage einer Fahrzeug-Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour rincer un filtre à charbon actif et pour tester l'étanchéité d'une instllation de réservoir à carburant pour moteur de véhicule connectée à ce filtre

Publication

EP 0864741 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97118908 A

Priority

DE 19709903 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864741A2] The device has the scavenging air from the atmosphere conducted over the active carbon trap into the induction system and the seal testing done over a time span by adjusting a test pressure in the hermetically sealed tank system with subsequent pressure drop measurement, which is done by a pressure sensor. The scavenging air is conducted upstream of the throttle device of the IC engine into the induction system and is delivered by an electric air pump whose delivery direction is reversed during seal testing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/0818 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864741 A2 19980916; EP 0864741 A3 19980930; EP 0864741 B1 20000531; DE 19709903 A1 19980917; ES 2146445 T3 20000801; US 5975062 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051031

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051030

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051030

2005-10-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051030

2004-10-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041012

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041008

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2003-06-13 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146445 T3

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701806 20000706

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000612

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990107

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971030

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI