Global Patent Index - EP 0864743 B1

EP 0864743 B1 2003-06-11 - Fuel injection valve for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Fuel injection valve for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de combustible pour moteurs à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0864743 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97120314 A

Priority

DE 19709795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864743A2] The fuel injection valve has in a valve body (1) an axially sliding valve member (5) which has a sealing face (7) at one end. With this face it works together with a valve seating face (9) on the valve body to control an injection cross-section. From the seating face, at least one injection opening leads into the combustion chamber. There is an electrical control member (23) operating the valve member axially through a hydraulic working chamber (19). A second electrical control member (27) is provided to operate the valve member, controlled independently of the first one. The hydraulic working chamber is bounded by a valve piston (17) connected to the valve member and by adjusting pistons (25,29) connected to the control members.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/04 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); F02M 47/046 (2013.01); F02M 2200/704 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864743 A2 19980916; EP 0864743 A3 20010808; EP 0864743 B1 20030611; DE 19709795 A1 19980917; JP H10252598 A 19980922

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2005-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051120

2004-07-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031006

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710265 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020208

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI