Global Patent Index - EP 0864744 B1

EP 0864744 B1 2002-12-11 - Improvements to devices for controlling a contactor for a vehicle starter motor

Title (en)

Improvements to devices for controlling a contactor for a vehicle starter motor

Title (de)

Verbesserung an Vorrichtungen zum Steuern eines Anlasschützes für einen Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Perfectionnement aux dispositif pour la commande d'un contacteur de démarreur de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0864744 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400553 A

Priority

FR 9703089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864744A1] The contactor control is applied to a starter motor contactor with a power contact that supplies the electric starter motor and a control winding which controls displacement of the power contact. A microprocessor circuit drives a power transistor which switches the control winding. The microprocessor circuit has the ability to block the power transistor when the fall in voltage (dU) at point at the battery supply potential between two successive instants (T2 and T2+TS) following the closing of the contact switch is less than a given value. The microprocessor circuit has an analog-to-digital converter at the voltage monitoring point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/087 (2013.01); F02N 11/106 (2013.01); F02N 2200/063 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 5345901 A 19940913 - SIEGENTHALER DAVID R [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864744 A1 19980916; EP 0864744 B1 20021211; DE 69809984 D1 20030123; DE 69809984 T2 20030724; ES 2189104 T3 20030701; FR 2760891 A1 19980918; FR 2760891 B1 19990528; US 6011317 A 20000104

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809984

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110310

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090310

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189104 T3

2003-03-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-03-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809984 20030123

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990301

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI