Global Patent Index - EP 0864755 A3

EP 0864755 A3 2000-11-29 - Double pump with sequential or synchronous operation

Title (en)

Double pump with sequential or synchronous operation

Title (de)

Doppelpumpe mit Einzel- und Synchronbetrieb

Title (fr)

Double pompe à fonctionnement séquentiel ou synchrone

Publication

EP 0864755 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98104145 A

Priority

DE 19710675 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864755A2] The twin pump assembly, with a control switch action between the first pump for small volume flows and a second pump for larger volume flows, sets the rotary speed of the first pump at a continuous increase until the pumped flow Q* reaches a given level when the second pump is switched into use. The control returns the first pump into service, when the pumped flow drops to the set level Q*. With a pumped flow of Q ≥ Q*, both pumps are operated at the same rotary speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 15/00; F04D 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/00 (2013.01); F04D 15/029 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864755 A2 19980916; EP 0864755 A3 20001129; EP 0864755 B1 20030813; EP 0864755 B2 20110316; DE 19710675 A1 19980917; DE 19710675 B4 20120112; DE 19710675 B8 20120329

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59809242

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150304

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150305

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-20 [REG FR D7] WITHDRAWAL FROM PROCEEDINGS AFTER LODGING OF APPEAL BEFORE COUR D'APPEL

2012-07-20 [REG FR RU] APPEAL FORMED BEFORE THE COURT OF APPEALS

- Effective date: 20120618

2011-05-19 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59809242

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-03-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GRUNDFOS A/S

- Effective date: 20040513

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809242 P 20031002

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILO AG

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020710

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 15/00 A, 7F 04D 15/02 B

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI