Global Patent Index - EP 0864822 A3

EP 0864822 A3 2000-05-03 - Method and device for operating a boiler with a large water volume

Title (en)

Method and device for operating a boiler with a large water volume

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Betreiben eines Grosswasserraumkessels

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour faire fonctionner une chaudière à grande capacité d'eau

Publication

EP 0864822 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98103405 A

Priority

DE 19709865 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864822A2] The method involves the boiler's water space (13) having both a back (14) and forward (21) flow pipe attached. The backflow pipe contains a nozzle-type pipe (17). A connecting pipe (19) leads from the forward flow pipe into the annular space (18) between the backflow pipe and the nozzle-type pipe. The inlet cross-sections of the forward flow and connecting pipes are on parallel planes. A deflector plate (15) is spaced apart from and below the end of the backflow pipe protruding into the water space.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/12; F24H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/22 (2006.01); F24H 9/00 (2006.01); F24H 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/122 (2013.01); F24H 9/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864822 A2 19980916; EP 0864822 A3 20000503; CZ 9800490 A3 19980916; DE 19709865 A1 19980917; PL 325148 A1 19980914

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030902

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020311

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE LI NL

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OMNICAL GMBH

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI NL

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI