Global Patent Index - EP 0864842 A3

EP 0864842 A3 2000-09-06 - Sporting area comprising a shooting range

Title (en)

Sporting area comprising a shooting range

Title (de)

Sportplatz mit einem Schiessstand

Title (fr)

Terrainde sport muni d'un stand de tir

Publication

EP 0864842 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98104505 A

Priority

DE 29704604 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864842A2] The sports field has at least one track (2) on which one or more obstacles are positioned. At least one shooting range is arranged in the region of the track, and the obstacles are designed so that they can be crossed by a person with a firearm. The range may have a bordered region (7) for firing, and a bordered strip (8) with a defined distance between the firing point and the target (9). The latter two may be connected using electromagnetic transmission and receiving equipment. The obstacle may also be a double-ramp (3), or a high platform (5) with step- like elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41J 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 19/00 (2006.01); F41J 11/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41J 11/00 (2013.01); A63C 19/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29704604 U1 19970515; EP 0864842 A2 19980916; EP 0864842 A3 20000906

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-06-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI