Global Patent Index - EP 0864892 A3

EP 0864892 A3 2000-08-23 - Lens-system for coupling a semiconductor laser and an optical fiber

Title (en)

Lens-system for coupling a semiconductor laser and an optical fiber

Title (de)

Linsensystem zur Ankopplung eines Halbleiterlasers an eine Lichtleitfaser

Title (fr)

Système de lentilles pour l'accouplage d'un laser à sémiconducteur à une fibre optique

Publication

EP 0864892 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97119869 A

Priority

DE 19710272 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0864892A2] The lens system uses at least one anamorphotic optical element (22), for matching the elliptical field distribution of the semiconductor laser (12) to the circular field distribution of the optical fibre (14). The anamorphotic optical element is inserted between a circular symmetrical collimation lens (18) associated with the semiconductor laser and a circular symmetrical focussing lens (20) associated with the optical fibre.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/42; G02B 27/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/42 (2006.01); G02B 13/08 (2006.01); G02B 27/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 27/0966 (2013.01); G02B 6/4206 (2013.01); G02B 13/08 (2013.01); G02B 27/09 (2013.01); G02B 27/0911 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0864892 A2 19980916; EP 0864892 A3 20000823; DE 19710272 A1 19980917

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020601

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI