Global Patent Index - EP 0865175 A3

EP 0865175 A3 2000-05-10 - Radio receiver capable of receiving signals from a plurality of transmission systems such as Digital Audio Broadcast (DAB) and Radio Data System (RDS)

Title (en)

Radio receiver capable of receiving signals from a plurality of transmission systems such as Digital Audio Broadcast (DAB) and Radio Data System (RDS)

Title (de)

Rundfunkempfänger für den Empfang von Signalen von mehreren Uebertragungssystemen wie z.B. des digitalen Tonrundfunks und des Radiodatensystems

Title (fr)

Récepteur de programmes radiophoniques, qui est capable de capter plusieurs systèmes de transmission, comme par example la radiodiffusion numérique (DAB) et la transmission de données supplémentaires (RDS)

Publication

EP 0865175 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98100073 A

Priority

JP 2448997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0865175A2] In a car-mount DAB/RDS radio receiver 40, interrupt information of both DAB and RDS can be listen. A user preselects a combination of broadcast systems (DAB and RDS) which an interrupt is accepted, and interrupt information of the selected broadcast system is listen from speakers 54.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/06 (2006.01); H04B 1/18 (2006.01); H04H 20/00 (2008.01); H04H 40/18 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/26 (2013.01); H04H 40/18 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0865175 A2 19980916; EP 0865175 A3 20000510; EP 0865175 B1 20041006; DE 69826751 D1 20041111; DE 69826751 T2 20051006; DE 865175 T1 19990422; JP 3466407 B2 20031110; JP H10209985 A 19980807

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140105

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-30 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69826751

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04H0001000000

- IPC: H04H0040000000

- Effective date: 20140922

2014-10-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69826751

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140105

2014-09-22 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69826751

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04H0001000000

- IPC: H04H0040000000

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69826751

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130103

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130102

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, YOKOHAMA-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD, TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69826751

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69826751

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69826751

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826751 P 20041111

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011211

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-22 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1998-09-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI