Global Patent Index - EP 0865329 B1

EP 0865329 B1 2002-09-18 - MACHINE FOR REMOVING WRAP-AROUND LABELS OR SHRINK-WRAPS FROM BOTTLES OR SIMILAR DEVICES

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR REMOVING WRAP-AROUND LABELS OR SHRINK-WRAPS FROM BOTTLES OR SIMILAR DEVICES

Title (de)

MASCHINE ZUM ENTFERNEN VON RUNDUMETIKETTEN ODER SCHRUMPFHÜLSEN VON FLASCHEN ODER DGL.

Title (fr)

MACHINE POUR RETIRER DE BOUTEILLES OU ANALOGUE DES ETIQUETTES CIRCULAIRES OU DES ENVELOPPES RETRACTABLES

Publication

EP 0865329 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97940045 A

Priority

  • DE 19630690 A
  • DE 19641156 A
  • DE 19643403 A
  • EP 9704129 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9804367A1] This invention concerns a machine (50) for removing wrap-around labels (2) or shrink-wraps from bottles or similar devices (1). To achieve a simple and compact embodiment of such a machine (50), the cutting blades (62) are located in the intake area of the machine (50).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/08 (2006.01); B65C 3/06 (2006.01); B65C 3/16 (2006.01); B65C 9/00 (2006.01); B65C 9/22 (2006.01); B65D 23/08 (2006.01); G09F 3/04 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/16 (2013.01); B08B 9/083 (2013.01); B65C 3/065 (2013.01); B65C 9/00 (2013.01); B65C 9/0015 (2013.01); B65C 9/2208 (2013.01); B65D 23/0842 (2013.01); G09F 3/04 (2013.01); G09F 3/10 (2013.01); B65C 2009/0025 (2013.01); B65C 2009/0059 (2013.01); B65D 2203/02 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0273 (2013.01); Y10S 83/924 (2013.01); Y10S 83/946 (2013.01); Y10S 156/936 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1126 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1142 (2013.01); Y10T 156/19 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9804367 A1 19980205; AT 224245 T 20021015; BR 9706649 A 20010828; DE 59708259 D1 20021024; EP 0865329 A1 19980923; EP 0865329 B1 20020918; JP 4008036 B2 20071114; JP H11512972 A 19991109; US 6199615 B1 20010313

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160730

2017-07-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708259

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160730

2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160730

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160730

2017-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 224245 T

- Effective date: 20160730

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708259 20021024

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224245 T 20021015

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010502

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRONES AG

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980202

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI