Global Patent Index - EP 0865379 B1

EP 0865379 B1 2000-04-05 - PACKAGING MACHINE WITH FORMING TUBE

Title (en)

PACKAGING MACHINE WITH FORMING TUBE

Title (de)

VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE MIT FORMROHR

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'EMBALLAGE COMPORTANT UN TUBE DE FACONNAGE

Publication

EP 0865379 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96903190 A

Priority

  • IB 9600206 W
  • IT BO950507 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9715497A1] Packaging machine with forming tube (1) around which a ribbon of flexible material (2) is wrapped, in order to shape a continuous sleeve (7), longitudinally sealed (3) to obtain, with subsequent transversal sealings (8, 9), filled and sealed packages, characterized by the fact that it is equipped with a shaping device (14) that produces on said sleeve, along the part between two transversal subsequent sealings, a gusset (14) that is able to constitute the bottom structure of the package, that will have, when turned and placed over a horizontal ground, the necessary base to stand up steadily in vertical position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/2042 (2013.01); B65B 9/20 (2013.01); B65B 61/188 (2013.01); B65B 9/2056 (2013.01); B65B 61/16 (2013.01); B65B 61/186 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9715497 A1 19970501; AU 4730596 A 19970515; CN 1200703 A 19981202; DE 69607644 D1 20000511; DE 69607644 T2 20001005; EP 0865379 A1 19980923; EP 0865379 B1 20000405; ES 2146868 T3 20000816; IT 1280255 B1 19980105; IT BO950507 A1 19970428; IT BO950507 D0 19951026

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110313

2012-04-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-03-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69607644

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100408

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100416

- Year of fee payment: 15

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146868 T3

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607644 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990716

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980414

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR