Global Patent Index - EP 0865502 A4

EP 0865502 A4 2000-08-16 - A FLUORESCENCE-BASED SCREENING METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING LIGANDS

Title (en)

A FLUORESCENCE-BASED SCREENING METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING LIGANDS

Title (de)

AUF FLUORESZENZ BASIERENDES ERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR LIGANDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CRIBLAGE PAR FLUORESCENCE DESTINE A L'IDENTIFICATION DE LIGANDS

Publication

EP 0865502 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96944304 A

Priority

  • US 9619698 W
  • US 834695 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9720952A1] A novel method for screening chemical compounds for potential pharmaceutical effectiveness is provided. The disclosed method identifies possible therapeutic test ligands by placing them in the presence of target proteins and determining the ability of test ligands to prevent the partial unfolding of the target protein by measuring the fluorescence emission of a conformation-sensitive probe. This differs significantly from known methods of novel pharmaceutical testing in that the biochemical function of the target protein need not be known and the existence of any known ligands of the target protein is unnecessary.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/543

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/533 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/58 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/68 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6811 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6816 (2013.01); G01N 33/582 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0613007 A2 19940831 - LILLY CO ELI [US], et al
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 7526, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class B04, AN 75-43214w, XP002024012
  • See also references of WO 9720952A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9720952 A1 19970612; CA 2236339 A1 19970612; DE 865502 T1 19990819; EP 0865502 A1 19980923; EP 0865502 A4 20000816; JP 2000502440 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANADYS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 33/68 A, 7C 12Q 1/68 B, 7G 01N 33/53 B, 7G 01N 33/543 B, 7G 01N 33/58 B

2000-08-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-19 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1999-06-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1999-05-14 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1999-04-14 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: RICCARDI SERGIO & CO.

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980530

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE