Global Patent Index - EP 0865513 A4

EP 0865513 A4 2001-02-21 - SPUTTERING OF LITHIUM

Title (en)

SPUTTERING OF LITHIUM

Title (de)

SPUTTERN VON LITHIUM

Title (fr)

PULVERISATION DE LITHIUM

Publication

EP 0865513 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96943612 A

Priority

  • US 9619408 W
  • US 56778195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6039850A] Lithium is sputtered from a target with a metallic lithium surface using an alternating sputtering potential with a frequency between about 8 and about 120 kHz, preferably about 10-100 kHz or using a DC sputtering potential and a reverse cleaning potential applied intermittently. The process can be used to apply lithium to electrochromic materials such as coatings on window glass.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 14/34; C23C 14/35; C23C 14/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/15 (2006.01); C23C 14/18 (2006.01); C23C 14/34 (2006.01); C23C 14/35 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 37/3426 (2013.01); C23C 14/185 (2013.01); C23C 14/3414 (2013.01); C23C 14/3464 (2013.01); C23C 14/352 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 8912844 A1 19891228 - EIC LAB INC [US]
  • [A] DD 252205 A1 19871209 - ARDENNE FORSCHUNGSINST [DD]
  • [A] FR 2685011 A1 19930618 - ELF AQUITAINE [FR]
  • [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 411 (E - 0973) 5 September 1990 (1990-09-05)
  • [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 382 (C - 535) 12 October 1988 (1988-10-12)
  • [YA] ANONYMOUS: "ARC Melting Technique For Fabricating Small Sputtering Targets. August 1979.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 3, 1 August 1979 (1979-08-01), New York, US, pages 1228 - 1229, XP002155996
  • See also references of WO 9720962A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6039850 A 20000321; AT 372399 T 20070915; AU 1281097 A 19970627; AU 703062 B2 19990311; BR 9611887 A 19990217; CA 2238319 A1 19970612; CA 2238319 C 20010417; DE 69637232 D1 20071018; DE 69637232 T2 20080103; EP 0865513 A1 19980923; EP 0865513 A4 20010221; EP 0865513 B1 20070905; ES 2293652 T3 20080316; JP 2000509100 A 20000718; JP 4059302 B2 20080312; US 5830336 A 19981103; WO 9720962 A1 19970612

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161206

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161204

2016-12-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161204

2016-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69637232

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151202

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071205

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071205

2008-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080606

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070905

2008-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071205

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080206

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071206

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070905

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2293652 T3

2008-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070905

2008-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20070905

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070905

2007-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SAGE ELECTROCHROMICS, INC.; US

- Free text: SAGE ELECTROCHROMICS, INC.; 2150 AIRPORT DRIVE, SUITE 2: FARIBAULT, MINNESOTA 55021 (US) -TRANSFER TO- SAGE ELECTROCHROMICS, INC.; ONE SAGE WAY; FARIBAULT, MN 55021 (US)

2007-10-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-10-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD & SIEDSMA AG

2007-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69637232 P 20071018

2007-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV RO SI

2007-09-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-07-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1010564

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGE ELECTROCHROMICS, INC.

2001-02-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010105

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 23C 14/34 A, 7C 23C 14/35 B, 7C 23C 14/18 B

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980604

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 980604;LT PAYMENT 980604;LV PAYMENT 980604;RO PAYMENT 980604;SI PAYMENT 980604