Global Patent Index - EP 0865529 B1

EP 0865529 B1 2001-03-28 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DELIVERING ARTICLES OF LAUNDRY

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DELIVERING ARTICLES OF LAUNDRY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON WÄSCHESTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ACHEMINER DES ARTICLES TEXTILES

Publication

EP 0865529 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96938063 A

Priority

  • DE 19541211 A
  • EP 9604792 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19541211A1] The invention concerns a method and device for delivering articles of laundry, in particular articles of clothing, which are conveyed suspended on conveying hangers (3) to an automatic folding machine (1). The articles of laundry (2) are transferred together with the conveying hangers (3) to the automatic folding machine which are then removed from the moving articles of laundry (2) during the conveying step. The article of laundry (2) and the conveying hanger (3) are moved substantially in the same direction during the removal of the hanger and are guided and driven independently during this step. The released conveying hangers (3) are moved more quickly than the article of laundry (2) and are thus removed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 89/02; D06F 95/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 89/02 (2006.01); D06F 95/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 89/02 (2013.01); D06F 95/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19541211 A1 19970507; AT 200119 T 20010415; EP 0865529 A1 19980923; EP 0865529 B1 20010328; WO 9717488 A1 19970515

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606676

2016-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-08-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151104

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HERBERT KANNEGIESSER GMBH + CO.

- Free text: HERBERT KANNEGIESSER GMBH + CO.#KANNEGIESSERRING#32602 VLOTHO (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HERBERT KANNEGIESSER GMBH + CO.#KANNEGIESSERRING#32602 VLOTHO (DE)

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011104

2001-09-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606676 20010503

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-03-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200119 T 20010415

2000-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HERBERT KANNEGIESSER GMBH + CO.

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991125

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980528

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL