Global Patent Index - EP 0865545 B1

EP 0865545 B1 2000-08-23 - CONSUMER ARTICLE COMPRISING A WC BASKET UNIT AND RE-FILL BOTTLE

Title (en)

CONSUMER ARTICLE COMPRISING A WC BASKET UNIT AND RE-FILL BOTTLE

Title (de)

VERKAUFSEINHEIT, BESTEHEND AUS EINEM WC-KÖRBCHEN UND EINER NACHFÜLLFLASCHE

Title (fr)

ARTICLE DE CONSOMMATION COMPOSE D'UNE CORBEILLE WC ET D'UNE RECHARGE

Publication

EP 0865545 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96942361 A

Priority

  • DE 19546734 A
  • EP 9605445 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19546734A1] The WC basket unit has a container (3) which is placed in the toilet bowl and a securing element (4) extending from the container (3) outwards for attachment to the bowl rim. The container (3) lies on the upper side (6) of the closure cap (1) of the re-fill bottle (2) and is detachably connected there to the cap (1) by a projection (7) which fits inside a matching recess (8). A releasable snap-in connection (10) is provided between the securing element (4) and re-fill bottle (2). The visually attractive, compact and easily produced consumer article requires no additional connecting means between the WC basket unit and re-fill bottle (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/02; B65D 51/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/28 (2006.01); E03D 9/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/28 (2013.01); E03D 9/032 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19546734 A1 19970619; DE 19546734 C2 19971218; AT 195778 T 20000915; BG 102536 A 19981230; BG 62293 B1 19990730; DK 0865545 T3 20001227; EP 0865545 A1 19980923; EP 0865545 B1 20000823; ES 2150704 T3 20001201; GR 3034678 T3 20010131; HU 221562 B 20021128; HU 9904403 A2 20000428; HU 9904403 A3 20000529; PL 181269 B1 20010731; PL 326453 A1 19980928; PT 865545 E 20001229; SK 284717 B6 20050908; SK 77198 A3 19981104; US 6189696 B1 20010220; WO 9721882 A1 19970619

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605798

2016-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141206

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160128

2015-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150722

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-09-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-09-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-09-03 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20000402365

- Effective date: 20150722

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 195778 T

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-08-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141206

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150605

2015-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-07-29 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-06-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150605

2014-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20131114

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20131212

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131204

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130605

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131212

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-12-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150704 T3

2000-11-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605798 20000928

2000-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19980606;SI PAYMENT 19980606

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195778 T 20000915

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990924

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980606

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 980606;SI PAYMENT 980606