Global patent index - EP 0865546 B1

EP 0865546 B1 2001-02-28 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE COLLECTION AND THE DISPOSAL OF THE DEJECTIONS FROM PATIENTS CONFINED TO BED IN SANITARY INSTITUTES

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE COLLECTION AND THE DISPOSAL OF THE DEJECTIONS FROM PATIENTS CONFINED TO BED IN SANITARY INSTITUTES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SAMMELN UND WEGRÄUMEN VON ENTLASTUNG VON BETTLÄGERIGEN PATIENTEN IN GESUNDHEITSINSTITUTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL SERVANT A RECUEILLIR ET A EVACUER LES DEJECTIONS DE MALADES GRABATAIRES DANS LES ETABLISSEMENTS MEDICAUX

Publication

EP 0865546 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96941815 A

Priority

  • IT 9600246 W
  • IT FI950251 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9721000A1] Method for the collection and the disposal of the dejections from patients confined to bed comprising the use of a film of polyvinyl alcohol to line the collection pad and the treatment of the wrapper containing the dejection with hot water at a temperature not lower than 60 DEG C simultaneously submitting it to a mechanical mincing. The suspension thus obtained can be disposed of through the sewer system. The apparatus to implement the method comprises a container (10) with a blade mixer (12), in which the wrapper is immersed with hot water produced by an external heater (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/10; A61F 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 9/00 (2006.01); E03D 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 9/003 (2013.01); E03D 9/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB GR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9721000 A1 19970612; AT 199422 T 20010315; AU 1109097 A 19970627; DE 69611933 D1 20010405; DE 69611933 T2 20011004; EP 0865546 A1 19980923; EP 0865546 B1 20010228; IT 1278805 B1 19971128; IT FI950251 A1 19970606; IT FI950251 D0 19951206

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041206

2003-12-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031203

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611933

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR LI

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199422

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990510

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980629

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR LI