Global Patent Index - EP 0865549 B1

EP 0865549 B1 2000-03-22 - Lining panel, a method for manufacturing the same, and the use of a fire retardant composition or the panel

Title (en)

Lining panel, a method for manufacturing the same, and the use of a fire retardant composition or the panel

Title (de)

Verkleidungspaneel, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung, und Gebrauch einer feuerhemmenden Komposition für das Paneel

Title (fr)

Panneau de revêtement, procédé de fabrication associé, et utilisation d'une composition ignifugeante pour le panneau

Publication

EP 0865549 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96941675 A

Priority

  • FI 9600664 W
  • FI 956010 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9721884A1] A fire-resistant, insulating lining panel comprised of an insulating layer (1) of mineral wool and a covering material layer (2, 3) placed on both sides of said insulating layer. Onto the mineral wool layer (1) acting as the insulation is first applied a reinforcing fabric (2), after which onto the reinforcing fabric (2) and the insulation (1) is applied a layer of a fire-resistant binding compound (3) containing magnesium chloride in an amount sufficient for making said binding compound noncombustible after setting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/94 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/942 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9721884 A1 19970619; AU 1098997 A 19970703; DE 69607375 D1 20000427; DE 69607375 T2 20000921; DE 69607375 T3 20060105; DK 0865549 T3 20000828; EP 0865549 A1 19980923; EP 0865549 B1 20000322; EP 0865549 B2 20050427; ES 2144794 T3 20000616; FI 956010 A0 19951214; FI 956010 A 19970615; GR 3033743 T3 20001031; NO 309903 B1 20010417; NO 982739 A 19980812; NO 982739 D0 19980612; PT 865549 E 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69607375

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131216

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131216

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131216

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KAEFER ISOLIERTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG, 28195 BREMEN, DE

- Document: DE 69607375

- Effective date: 20111208

2012-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607375

- Representative's name: ZACCO DR. PETERS UND PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20111208

2012-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111223

2011-12-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111201 AND 20111207

2011-02-04 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Free text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 06/25 - 3.2.

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2008-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051231

2008-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051217

2006-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060616

2006-06-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-06-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060616

2005-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-07-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2005-04-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO

2005-04-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-01-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050112

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20041228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20041227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-23 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20041223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-16 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20041216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S

2002-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: IPPOKAMPOS SA

2002-02-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S * 20001221 IPPOKAMPOS S

- Effective date: 20001221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: IPPOKAMPOS SA

2001-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S

2001-02-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-02-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: IPPOKAMPOS SA

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-02-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-08-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144794 T3

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607375 20000427

2000-04-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19980526

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

1999-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KAEFER ISOLIERTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

1999-09-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LINING PANEL, A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME, AND THE USE OF A FIRE RETARDANT COMPOSITION OR THE PANEL

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981016

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980526

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 980526