Global Patent Index - EP 0865575 B1

EP 0865575 B1 2002-12-04 - DOUBLE WORM SYSTEM

Title (en)

DOUBLE WORM SYSTEM

Title (de)

ZWILLINGSSCHRAUBENSATZ

Title (fr)

SYSTEME A VIS JUMELEES

Publication

EP 0865575 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96920676 A

Priority

  • CH 9600250 W
  • CH 348795 A
  • CH 362795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9721925A1] In prior art designs, single-flight cast double worms with angles of contact > 720 DEG with large balance hollows at both ends and worm lengths of whole multiples of the pitch operate in the medium rotation speed ranges ( SIMILAR 3000 min<-1>) without imbalance. The desired use of special uncastable materials and the manufacturing complexity and the necessary dimensional stability even for extreme profile geometries pose additional problems in balancing which are solved by the present invention. Here, it is possible, by varying the angle of contact of the worm and any balance hollows and/or by altering the contour of the worms in the medium engagement region, to reduce the size of the balance hollows, sometimes to "zero", and with the possible use of additional masses. Besides the advantage of simple raw component manufacture, worms balanced in this way also permit the use of special materials and extreme worm geometries for fitting in pumps used in the chemical, medical and food sectors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/16 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/16 (2013.01); F04C 15/0042 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9721925 A1 19970619; AT 229127 T 20021215; AU 6186196 A 19970703; AU 719268 B2 20000504; CA 2240168 A1 19970619; CA 2240168 C 20071127; CN 1083536 C 20020424; CN 1207794 A 19990210; CZ 289289 B6 20011212; CZ 9801772 A3 20000315; DE 59609957 D1 20030116; DK 0865575 T3 20030324; DK 0865575 T4 20070402; EP 0865575 A1 19980923; EP 0865575 B1 20021204; EP 0865575 B2 20061129; EP 0865575 B9 20030502; EP 0865575 B9 20070606; ES 2186785 T3 20030516; JP 2000501809 A 20000215; JP 3330955 B2 20021007; KR 100384925 B1 20030821; NO 982674 A 19980807; NO 982674 D0 19980610; PT 865575 E 20030430; SK 78098 A3 19990211; US 6139297 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090708

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090708

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090708

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090708

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090708

2010-03-08 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *ATELIERS BUSCH

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080711

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080704

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080716

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080721

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080707

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080710

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080808

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080705

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-06-22 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2007-04-02 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2007-03-21 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2007-02-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20061129

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040709

2006-12-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-11-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20061129

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040709

2005-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2005-03-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-01-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-07-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-07-01 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040701

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH

2003-10-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH

- Effective date: 20030829

2003-07-08 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-09 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030609

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030604

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186785 T3

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-04-08 [REG SE RPOT] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED WITH A CORRECTED SWEDISH TRANSLATION

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-03-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609957 20030116

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229127 T 20021215

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010312

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980625

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE