Global Patent Index - EP 0865596 B1

EP 0865596 B1 2000-02-23 - RECOOLING SYSTEM

Title (en)

RECOOLING SYSTEM

Title (de)

RÜCKKÜHLSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE RETOUR

Publication

EP 0865596 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945758 A

Priority

  • DE 9602298 W
  • DE 19546188 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9721966A2] According to the invention, a recooling system for cooling water (K) from the condenser (2) of a stream-turbine power plant has a number of cooling modules (4), each of which can be fed via its own water supply shafts (20). Here, the water supply shafts (20) are connected together and to the condenser (2) via a common main cooling water pipe (8) of the communicating pipe type. Such a recooling system is particularly easy to install and operate .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28B 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28B 9/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9721966 A2 19970619; WO 9721966 A3 19970814; AU 1766097 A 19970703; AU 707461 B2 19990708; CA 2240099 A1 19970619; CA 2240099 C 20040706; CN 1131985 C 20031224; CN 1200170 A 19981125; DE 59604506 D1 20000330; EP 0865596 A2 19980923; EP 0865596 B1 20000223; ES 2143805 T3 20000516; IN 192591 B 20040508; JP 2000501827 A 20000215; JP 3839488 B2 20061101; KR 100408325 B1 20040318; RU 2164330 C2 20010320; US 6276446 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20161128

2016-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-11-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59604506

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160202

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151105

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151109

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-03-13 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143805

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604506

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-30

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990730

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980608

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI SE