Global Patent Index - EP 0865656 B1

EP 0865656 B1 2000-03-22 - TRANSFORMER WITH DIVIDED PRIMARY WINDING USED IN A BLOCKING-OSCILLATOR SUPPLY CIRCUIT

Title (en)

TRANSFORMER WITH DIVIDED PRIMARY WINDING USED IN A BLOCKING-OSCILLATOR SUPPLY CIRCUIT

Title (de)

TRANSFORMATOR MIT AUFGETEILTER PRIMÄRWICKLUNG IN EINER SPERRWANDLER-VERSORGUNGSSCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

TRANSFORMATEUR A ENROULEMENT PRIMAIRE DIVISE, UTILISE DANS UN CIRCUIT D'ALIMENTATION A CONVERTISSEUR A OSCILLATEUR BLOQUE

Publication

EP 0865656 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96934427 A

Priority

  • DE 9601774 W
  • DE 19545304 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19545304A1] The invention concerns a transformer (100) with a divided primary winding (P1a-c) for use in a blocking-oscillator supply circuit, the transformer having a secondary winding (S1) disposed between the parts of the primary winding, a magnetic core having an air gap (102) and, surrounding the core, a former on which the individual windings are wound. The transformer also has a row of connection pins to which the windings are connected. The transformer is designed in such a way that the primary winding is divided into at least three part-windings (P1a-c). That secondary winding which carries the most power for the longest time is divided into at least two part-windings (S1a, S1b). The part-windings of this secondary winding (S1) are each surrounded by two of the at least three part-windings of the primary winding on the former. One or more additional secondary windings (S2) may be located outside the composite winding (101) made up of the part-windings of the primary winding and the secondary winding carrying the most power.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/346 (2013.01); H01F 2019/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19545304 A1 19970612; EP 0865656 A1 19980923; EP 0865656 B1 20000322; JP 2000501246 A 20000202; US 6150914 A 20001121; WO 9721232 A1 19970612

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604803

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-09-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-11 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2002-10-04 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2002-08-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604803 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981001

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980706

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB