Global Patent Index - EP 0865660 B1

EP 0865660 B1 2000-02-16 - SWITCHGEAR CONTROL APPARATUS

Title (en)

SWITCHGEAR CONTROL APPARATUS

Title (de)

ANSTEUERGERÄT FÜR SCHALTGERÄTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR APPAREILS DE COMMUTATION

Publication

EP 0865660 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96946021 A

Priority

  • DE 9602283 W
  • DE 19545512 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9721237A2] Contactors or relays in particular generally have a magnet system comprising a coil with an armature and a yoke. A device has already been proposed for controlling the magnetic flux in the magnet system in a time-dependent manner according to a nominal curve calculated precisely for each magnet model. According to the invention, the control device (10) controls the magnetic flux within a predetermined range which is independent of time and travel. Preferably, the control device (10) controls the magnetic flux by means of the coil (1, 21) (coil flux). In particular, the narrow range set for the coil flux can be independent of time and travel, which is impossible with the prior art.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 47/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/06 (2006.01); H01H 47/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/325 (2013.01); H01F 2007/1894 (2013.01); H01H 2047/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9721237 A2 19970612; WO 9721237 A3 19970821; CN 1068968 C 20010725; CN 1202269 A 19981216; EP 0865660 A2 19980923; EP 0865660 B1 20000216; JP 2000501550 A 20000208

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-01-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604468 20000323

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990208

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980519

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR