Global Patent Index - EP 0865742 B1

EP 0865742 B1 2003-06-11 - Foldable fastener for a bracelet

Title (en)

Foldable fastener for a bracelet

Title (de)

Faltverschluss für Armbänder

Title (fr)

Fermoir pliant pour bracelets

Publication

EP 0865742 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98104158 A

Priority

CH 68097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0865742A1] The clasp, designed for fastening the two halves (7, 9) of a bracelet, comprises first and second clasp components (1, 2), a cover (5) and a locking mechanism. The clasp components (1, 2) are basically rigid in terms of lengthwise extension and/or deformation, while the lock comprises at least one hook-shaped lug (4.1, 4.2) attached to or forming part of the second clasp component, engaging with a matching projection (1.2, 1.2) on the first component. The hooks and lugs can be thick and solid and able to rotate relative to one another in the form of hinges or, in a variant of the design, the hooks can be elastic and made from sections of tubing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/24 (2006.01); F16B 2/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/24 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3779 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0865742 A1 19980923; EP 0865742 B1 20030611; DE 69815419 D1 20030717; DE 69815419 T2 20040108; HK 1010821 A1 20031107; JP 3836247 B2 20061025; JP H10262711 A 19981006; SG 68029 A1 20000418; US 6185799 B1 20010213

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROLEX SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLEX SA, CH

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090309

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090309

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-08-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815419 P 20030717

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLEX SA

2002-08-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FOLDABLE FASTENER FOR A BRACELET

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020213

1999-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MONTRES ROLEX SA

1999-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

1999-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990308

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI