Global Patent Index - EP 0865747 A3

EP 0865747 A3 2000-12-27 - Merchandising display stand

Title (en)

Merchandising display stand

Title (de)

Ständer zur Präsentation für Verkaufswecke

Title (fr)

Présentoir destiné à la vente de marchandises

Publication

EP 0865747 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105142 A

Priority

DE 29705072 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0865747A2] The display pillar structure, to hold merchandise for sale in shops and stores and supermarkets, and the like, has a foot section (1) which incorporates a standing pipe (2) or the like. A mounting (4) is at the upper end (3), to take the pillar structure placed over it round the pipe. The pillar structure is composed of a cover plate (50) and a base plate (51) together with one or more bonded profiles to hold the shelf carriers (6) or display holders. The cover plate (50) acts with the mounting (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29705072 U1 19980716; EP 0865747 A2 19980923; EP 0865747 A3 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-10-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19980923

1998-12-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOLLINGER, FRANZ

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI