Global Patent Index - EP 0865807 B1

EP 0865807 B1 2000-05-17 - Detachable tip for a snow shoe

Title (en)

Detachable tip for a snow shoe

Title (de)

Abnehmbare Spitze für einen Schneeschuh

Title (fr)

Spatule amovible pour raquette à neige

Publication

EP 0865807 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98410016 A

Priority

FR 9702948 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0865807A1] The removable tip (10) is fixed to the front (1a) of the snow shoe (1). It is rounded and its front part is raised. The shape of its back edge corresponds to the front edge of the snow shoe. It has two longitudinal ribs under its lower surface. The tip has two upper projections (18a,18b) and two lower projections that rest on upper and lower surfaces of the shoe. A central bar (20), extending backwards from the tip, has a hollow near its free end which engages on a stud on the upper surface of the shoe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 13/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2760374 A1 19980911; FR 2760374 B1 19990604; EP 0865807 A1 19980923; EP 0865807 B1 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050225

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): IT

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990729

1999-07-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

1999-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: IT

1999-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): IT

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990308

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): IT

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI