Global Patent Index - EP 0865870 A3

EP 0865870 A3 2000-05-17 - Method for sizing natural- or synthetic-stone elements, particularly ceramic tiles, and machine for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for sizing natural- or synthetic-stone elements, particularly ceramic tiles, and machine for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Formatieren von Natur- oder Kunststein-Elementen, insbesondere keramische Fliesen, und Maschine zum Anwenden dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour mettre à dimension des éléments en pierre naturelle ou synthétique, en particulier de carreaux en céramique, et machine pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0865870 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98103581 A

Priority

IT MO970039 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0865870A2] A method for sizing elements made of natural or synthetic stone, particularly ceramic tiles, and optionally also squaring such elements, by means of a dry abrasive tool (4) with wear compensation and single sizing of the element (5) being processed, avoiding the drawbacks of wet grinding and those linked to the complications due to size differences; the machine allows to rotate the abrasive tool (4) and to back it off axially, automatically and continuously in order to measure its wear and compensate for it at preset time intervals; application occurs particularly in ceramic factories for finishing the edges of tiles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 7/22; B23Q 7/02; B24B 9/06; B24B 47/22; B24B 49/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/22 (2006.01); B24B 9/06 (2006.01); B24B 47/22 (2006.01); B24B 49/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/06 (2013.01); B24B 7/22 (2013.01); B24B 47/22 (2013.01); B24B 49/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0865870 A2 19980923; EP 0865870 A3 20000517; EP 0865870 B1 20021211; DE 69809986 D1 20030123; ES 2186934 T3 20030516; IT 1292686 B1 19990211; IT MO970039 A1 19980911; PT 865870 E 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080303

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2007-03-05 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070305

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-02 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070302

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186934 T3

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-12 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809986 20030123

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT PT

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 24B 7/22 A, 7B 24B 9/06 B, 7B 24B 47/22 B, 7B 24B 49/18 B, 7B 23Q 7/02 B

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI