Global Patent Index - EP 0865925 B1

EP 0865925 B1 2001-12-19 - Ink cartridge for an ink jet printer or plotter

Title (en)

Ink cartridge for an ink jet printer or plotter

Title (de)

Tintenbehälter für einen Tintenstrahl-Drucker oder -Plotter

Title (fr)

Cartouche d'encre pour imprimante/traceur à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0865925 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810176 A

Priority

DE 19710970 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0865925A1] An ink reservoir comprises a casing (1) and lower section (2) including a sump (4). Around the sump's upper edge (16), there is a groove (17). A plug (10) is inserted into the sump's base (7). It will be penetrated by a hollow needle of the printer or plotter. A sump-shaped elastomeric membrane (18) has an edge bead (20) which is pressed into the groove. A cover (3) placed down onto the lower section has an inner wall (36) whose lower edge presses down onto the bead. Preferably there is an additional chamber (26) with a second plug (10). This chamber is filled with an absorbent (28), especially cellulose, to take up ink residues. The membrane is made of acrilonitrile butadiene rubber (NBR).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17553 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0865925 A1 19980923; EP 0865925 B1 20011219; CA 2232394 A1 19980917; DE 19710970 A1 19981001; DE 19710970 C2 20000810; US 5984461 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802491

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-08-30 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59802491

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY PRODUCTION AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PELIKAN HARDCOPY PRODUCTION AG, EGG, CH

- Document: DE 59802491

- Effective date: 20120116

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802491

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20120116

2012-01-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802491

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080303

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080303

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070605

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-03-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802491 20020131

2002-01-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011220

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY PRODUCTION AG

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

1999-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990125

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI