Global Patent Index - EP 0865995 B1

EP 0865995 B1 2000-01-26 - Thermoplastic packaging item, manufacture and use thereof

Title (en)

Thermoplastic packaging item, manufacture and use thereof

Title (de)

Verpackung aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung

Title (fr)

Article d'emballage en matière thermoplastique, sa fabrication et son utilisation

Publication

EP 0865995 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400598 A

Priority

FR 9703284 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0865995A1] The package, e.g. for containing an article and an instruction leaflet, consists of two layers (1, 4) of a relatively rigid transparent, translucent or opaque thermoplastic material, e.g. PVC, polystyrene or polypropylene, shaped by thermoforming. One of the layers has a raised portion (3) to contain the article, and the two layers are joined together by interlocking hollow ribs (2a - 2d; 5a - 5d) round their edges. The ribs comprise male and female components which taper at between 60 and 89 degrees, and preferably 75 - 85 degrees, towards their open sides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/32 (2013.01); B65D 75/322 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0865995 A1 19980923; EP 0865995 B1 20000126; DE 69800071 D1 20000302; FR 2761053 A1 19980925; FR 2761053 B1 19990430

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AUBRY LAURENT

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AUBRY LAURENT

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-04-27 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-04-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800071 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT PT

2000-01-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

1999-06-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT PT

1999-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

1999-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990212

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980924

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI