Global Patent Index - EP 0866019 B1

EP 0866019 B1 2002-11-20 - Escalator or walkway provided with a stiffening element

Title (en)

Escalator or walkway provided with a stiffening element

Title (de)

Fahrtreppe oder Fahrsteig mit Unterspannung

Title (fr)

Tapis ou escalier roulant avec raidisseur

Publication

EP 0866019 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98104156 A

Priority

  • EP 98104156 A
  • EP 97810154 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866019A1] The arrangement (1) consists of a balustrade (5) with a handrail (6), a balustrade base, steps and/or plates (4) for the transport of persons and objects, a support body (7), and guide carriers with guides for the steps and/or plates and the handrail. At least one tensioning device (9) is provided in the arrangement, which enables a slim construction of the support body. The tensioning device comprises pulling devices which are connected with the support body and at least one support.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/02; B66B 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866019 A1 19980923; EP 0866019 B1 20021120; EP 0866019 B2 20051116

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180308

2018-03-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180308

2018-03-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59806306

2018-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170309

2017-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228095 T

- Effective date: 20170309

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-06-16 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2006-05-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2006-02-01 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2005-12-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2005-11-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2003-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP FAHRTREPPEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20030817

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187843 T3

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806306 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228095 T 20021215

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

1999-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

1999-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990218

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI