Global Patent Index - EP 0866020 B1

EP 0866020 B1 2002-11-20 - Handrail assembly for escalator or moving walkway

Title (en)

Handrail assembly for escalator or moving walkway

Title (de)

Handlaufkonstruktion für Fahrtreppe oder Fahrsteig

Title (fr)

Assemblage de main-courante pour escalier ou trottoir roulant

Publication

EP 0866020 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98104549 A

Priority

  • EP 98104549 A
  • EP 97810166 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866020A1] The arrangement consists of a balustrade (3), a balustrade base, steps and/or plates for the transport of persons and objects, and a handrail construction with a handrail (4) arranged at the balustrade for the safety of the persons. The handrail is redirected in a roll-over area (1) of the balustrade by device of a support disk (10) carried by the balustrade and/or the handrail construction. The support disk comprises approximately the wall thickness of the balustrade and supports and diverts the handrail in its centre.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/22; B66B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/04 (2006.01); B66B 23/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/22 (2013.01); B66B 23/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866020 A1 19980923; EP 0866020 B1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 228096 T

- Effective date: 20180313

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180312

2018-04-04 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180312

2018-03-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-03-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59806307

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-03-29 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050928

2003-10-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP FAHRTREPPEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187844 T3

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806307 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228096 T 20021215

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

1999-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

1999-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990218

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI