Global Patent Index - EP 0866021 B1

EP 0866021 B1 2002-09-25 - Travelling gear for a lifting device movable on rails

Title (en)

Travelling gear for a lifting device movable on rails

Title (de)

Fahrwerk einer schienverfahrbaren Hebevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de translation pour un appareil de levage se déplaçant sur rails

Publication

EP 0866021 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98250081 A

Priority

DE 19713500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866021A2] The traversing gear of a lifting device that can travel on rails has running wheels (4) which roll on running surfaces (6) extending in the longitudinal direction of a rail (2) and has a friction wheel (8) which can be driven. The latter can be adjusted on a friction surface (10) extending in the longitudinal direction of the rail and is located in rotatable fashion in a pivoting lever (7) which presses it against the friction surface. The lever is of the double arm type, where the friction wheel is located on one side and the lifting device (3) on the other. The rail is one with a hollow profile, open to the bottom with running surfaces located inside.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 9/14; B66C 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 9/08 (2006.01); B66C 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 9/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866021 A2 19980923; EP 0866021 A3 19990303; EP 0866021 B1 20020925; DE 19713500 C1 19980924; JP H10265170 A 19981006; US 6050198 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805650

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805650

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070304

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060304

2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060305

2006-03-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060304

2005-03-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805650 20021031

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEMAG CRANES & COMPONENTS GMBH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

1999-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990816

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI