Global Patent Index - EP 0866022 A3

EP 0866022 A3 2000-04-05 - Testing apparatus and - method

Title (en)

Testing apparatus and - method

Title (de)

Prüfvorrichtung und - verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de contrôle

Publication

EP 0866022 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250099 A

Priority

DE 19713471 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866022A2] The test arrangement (2) tests functions of at least one component of a conveyor system comprising several components, especially a rotating tower crane. The arrangement comprises at least one connection (3) for connecting the at least one component, test devices for testing the functions of respectively different designs of the individual components. The arrangement includes a control device for the control and supervision of the testing of the functions, to simulate the control of the entire system, whereby the arrangement may test the cooperation of several components of the total system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/905 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866022 A2 19980923; EP 0866022 A3 20000405; DE 19713471 A1 19980924; DE 19713471 C2 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030728

2001-01-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

2001-01-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR IT LI LU NL

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH ES FR IT LI LU NL

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 66C 23/90 A, 7G 05B 23/02 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI