Global Patent Index - EP 0866180 A3

EP 0866180 A3 2000-03-01 - Structure for fixing faucet

Title (en)

Structure for fixing faucet

Title (de)

Wasserhahnmontageanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un robinet

Publication

EP 0866180 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98104472 A

Priority

  • JP 8604397 A
  • JP 16955097 A
  • JP 28360797 A
  • JP 31359597 A
  • JP 32821097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866180A2] A structure for fixing a faucet to a counter by using an adapter assembly. In the structure, an adapter and a holder for vertically clamping the counter therebetween are shifted relative to each other about a bolt connecting the adapter and the holder so as to prevent the backlash of the faucet in the rotational direction. An adapter assembly has only one holder 32 formed in a circular arc shape extending along a hole of the counter and having a long circumference length. The holder 32 is connected to the adapter 30 by screwing two bolts 34, 36 at both ends of the holder 32 in the circumferential direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/0402 (2013.01); E03C 1/0401 (2013.01); E03C 1/0403 (2013.01); E03C 2001/0415 (2013.01); E03C 2001/0416 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866180 A2 19980923; EP 0866180 A3 20000301; EP 0866180 B1 20040908; DE 69826047 D1 20041014; DE 69826047 T2 20050922; DE 69835176 D1 20060817; DE 69835176 T2 20070614; DE 69835176 T8 20070927; EP 1357233 A1 20031029; EP 1357233 B1 20060705; ES 2227736 T3 20050401; ES 2265076 T3 20070201

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100313

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100312

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090306

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090401

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227736 T3

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826047 P 20041014

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI