Global Patent Index - EP 0866195 A3

EP 0866195 A3 2000-08-02 - Anchoring means for facade coverings above an exterior wall insulation

Title (en)

Anchoring means for facade coverings above an exterior wall insulation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verankerung einer Fassadenverkleidung über einer Dämmung an einer Wand

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ancrage d'un revêtement de facade superposé à l'isolation du mur

Publication

EP 0866195 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98100771 A

Priority

DE 19712200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866195A2] The long hole (6) in the wall console (1) is for anchoring to the wall (7) with the aid of anchoring bolts (3). A circular disc-shaped reducing plate (2) is provided with through round inner holes. The reducing plate has an upper circular disc area with an upper outer diameter which is smaller than the cross diameter of the long hole and a lower circular disc area with a lower outer diameter which is less than the cross diameter of the long hole. The transition from the upper to the lower circular disc area runs in a staged formation. The height of the lower circular disc area vertical to the disc surface is less than the thickness of the wall console (1) in the area of the long hole (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/0805 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866195 A2 19980923; EP 0866195 A3 20000802; DE 19712200 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-05-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI