Global Patent Index - EP 0866206 A3

EP 0866206 A3 2000-06-21 - Device for supporting and driving a gather-up curtain

Title (en)

Device for supporting and driving a gather-up curtain

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Tragen und Bedienen eines Raffvorhanges

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support et de commande d'un rideau plissé

Publication

EP 0866206 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97830486 A

Priority

IT TO970234 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866206A2] A device for supporting and driving a gather-up curtain (1a) has top guiding passages (9) for vertical strips (6, 7) for raising the curtain, these passages being formed in elements rigidly connected to the supporting profile (3) of the curtain. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/262; A47H 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 5/14 (2006.01); E06B 9/262 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/262 (2013.01); E06B 2009/2622 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866206 A2 19980923; EP 0866206 A3 20000621; IT 1291216 B1 19981229; IT TO970234 A1 19980921

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-04-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 06B 9/262 A, 7A 47H 5/14 B

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI