Global Patent Index - EP 0866207 B1

EP 0866207 B1 2003-06-04 - Frame assembly equipped with a motorised shading device

Title (en)

Frame assembly equipped with a motorised shading device

Title (de)

Mit einer motorisierten Verdunkelungseinrichtung ausgerüstetes Rahmenbauteil

Title (fr)

Bloc baie équipé d'un produit d'occultation motorisé

Publication

EP 0866207 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98810160 A

Priority

FR 9703478 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866207A1] The casing comprises an opening (3) which is driven by a motor with both directions of rotation (B1,B2). The motor is controlled by a pair of switches (S1,S2) for each of its directions of rotation. The switches are integral parts of the motor and are operated by remote control (6). The remote control has two levers held in an inoperative position by springs. Outside the motor, is a flexible connection (14) running over a drive drum which has a manual rotation drive component whose ends are attached to each of the levers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/32; A47H 5/032; E06B 9/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 5/032 (2006.01); E06B 9/32 (2006.01); E06B 9/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 5/032 (2013.01); E06B 9/32 (2013.01); E06B 9/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866207 A1 19980923; EP 0866207 B1 20030604; AT 242412 T 20030615; DE 69815186 D1 20030710; DE 69815186 T2 20040519; ES 2121728 T1 19981216; ES 2121728 T3 20040316; FR 2761108 A1 19980925; FR 2761108 B1 19990528

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100227

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100227

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SOMFY

- Effective date: 20100228

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2121728 T3

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2003-12-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815186 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOMFY

2001-04-04 [D18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (DELETED)

2000-12-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000523

1999-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

1999-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990308

1998-12-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2121728 T1

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI